US SB2520 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-09 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
FOIA Improvement Act of 2014 - Amends the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) to: (1) require federal agencies to make agency records that can be disclosed under such Act available for public inspection in an electronic format, (2) limit the authority of an agency to charge a fee if the agency misses a deadline for complying with a FOIA request, (3) establish a presumption in favor of disclosure and prohibit the application of exemptions from FOIA based on technicalities, (4) expand the authority and duties of the Chief FOIA Officer of each agency for promoting compliance with the FOIA disclosure requirements, and (5) establish a Chief FOIA Officers Council to develop recommendations for increasing compliance with FOIA requirements. Requires the head of each federal agency to: (1) review agency regulations and issue regulations for the disclosure of records in accordance with the amendments to FOIA made by this Act, and (2) include in such regulations procedures for engaging in dispute resolution through the FOIA Public Liaison and the Office of Government Information Services. Expands the program for the efficient management of federal agency records to require agency heads to establish procedures for: (1) identifying records of general interest or use to the public that are appropriate for public disclosure, and (2) posting such records in a publicly-accessible electronic format. Prohibits the authorization of additional funds to carry out the requirements of this Act.
Title
FOIA Improvement Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-12-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-08 | Senate | By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 113-287. |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375-6377; text as passed Senate: CR S6375-6377) |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 605. |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3942-3944) |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3942) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1211 (Related) 2014-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Freedom of information
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Administrative remedies
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Freedom of information
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations