US SB249 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State to include additional information in its annual reports concerning Taiwan's participation at the World Health Organization's World Health Assembly (WHA) as an observer. The report shall describe changes and improvements to the State Department's plan to support Taiwan's observer status at the WHA, following any meetings at which Taiwan did not participate under such status. (China has opposed Taiwan's participation, based on its position that Taiwan is part of China and not a separate country.) The State Department shall regularly report to Congress on U.S. actions and plans to strengthen Taiwan's official and unofficial diplomatic relationships around the world.
Title
A bill to direct the Secretary of State to develop a strategy to regain observer status for Taiwan in the World Health Organization, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-05-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2346-2347) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.1582 Amendment SA 1582 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.1582 Amendment SA 1582 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Inhofe. (consideration: CR S2346-2347; text: CR S2346-2347) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S2346) |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2345-2347) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 100. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB237 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation.
HB353 (Same As) 2019-01-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB353 (Same As) 2019-01-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.