US SB249 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 174.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to provide that the pueblo of Santa Clara may lease for 99 years certain restricted land, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Indian Long-Term Leasing Act to expand the land of the Pueblo of Santa Clara and Ohkay Owingeh pueblo that may be leased for up to 99 years with the approval of the Department of the Interior, from lands held in trust, to all of the lands of the Pueblo of Santa Clara and Ohkay Owingeh pueblo.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to provide that the pueblo of Santa Clara may lease for 99 years certain restricted land, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-24HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 174.
2017-07-24HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-242.
2017-06-27HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-06-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-06-07HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-05-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-05-11HouseReceived in the House.
2017-05-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-05-08SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2814; text as passed Senate: CR S2814)
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 22.
2017-03-22SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-8.
2017-02-08SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported favorably.
2017-02-01SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1787 (Same As) 2017-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
SB140 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 115-282.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback