US SB2472 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-263.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-263.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates the NASA John H. Glenn Research Center at Plum Brook Station in Ohio as the "NASA John H. Glenn Research Center at the Neil A. Armstrong Test Facility."
Title
Neil A. Armstrong Test Facility Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-263. |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-12-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7222-7223) |
2020-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2472. |
2020-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7222-7224) |
2020-12-16 | House | Ms. Horn, Kendra S. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-06-29 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-06-29 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3273; text: CR S3273) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 433. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-218. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4790 (Same As) 2019-10-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Ohio
Science, technology, communications
Space flight and exploration
Spacecraft and satellites
U.S. history
Government buildings, facilities, and property
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Ohio
Science, technology, communications
Space flight and exploration
Spacecraft and satellites
U.S. history