US SB246 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on October 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-244. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on October 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-14 - Became Public Law No: 114-244. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children Act (Sec. 3) This bill establishes the Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children in the Office of Tribal Justice of the Department of Justice. The commission must conduct a comprehensive study of federal, state, local, and tribal programs that serve Native children, including an evaluation of: the impact of concurrent jurisdiction on child welfare systems; barriers Indian tribes and Native Hawaiians face in using public and private grant resources; obstacles to nongovernmental financial support for programs benefitting Native children; issues relating to the validity and statistical significance of data on Native children; barriers to the development of sustainable, multidisciplinary programs designed to assist high-risk Native children and their families; cultural or socioeconomic challenges in communities of Native children; examples of successful program models and use of best practices in programs that serve children and families; barriers to interagency coordination; and the use of memoranda of agreement or interagency agreements to facilitate or improve agency coordination. The commission must use the results of the study and analyses of existing federal data to: (1) develop plans for federal policy relating to Native children informed by the development of accurate child well-being measures; (2) recommend modifications and improvements to programs for Native children that integrate the cultural strengths of Native communities; (3) recommend improvements to the collection of data regarding Native children and the programs that serve them; and (4) identify models of successful programs. When developing plans for federal policy, the commission may not consider or recommend recognition or establishment of a government-to-government relationship with an entity not recognized on or before the date of enactment of this bill. The commission must report its findings, conclusions, and recommendations for legislative and administrative action. The commission is terminated 90 days after the report is submitted.
Title
Alyce Spotted Bear and Walter Soboleff Commission on Native Children Act
Sponsors
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-244. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-10-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-10-03 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-09-29 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-09-29 | House | Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6286) |
2016-09-13 | House | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2016-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5287-5289) |
2016-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 246. |
2016-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5287-5289) |
2016-09-12 | House | Mrs. Radewagen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 560. |
2016-09-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-722. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2016-05-18 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-06-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-06-01 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-06-01 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3381-3385; text as passed Senate: CR S3381-3383) |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 79. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-39. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S422-423) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2751 (Related) 2015-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Adoption and foster care
Advisory bodies
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Census and government statistics
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Department of Justice
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elementary and secondary education
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Medicaid
Mental health
Minority education
Minority health
Native Americans
Nutrition and diet
Preschool education
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
Adoption and foster care
Advisory bodies
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Census and government statistics
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Department of Justice
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elementary and secondary education
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Medicaid
Mental health
Minority education
Minority health
Native Americans
Nutrition and diet
Preschool education
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education