US SB239 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Became Public Law No: 116-65. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Became Public Law No: 116-65. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 3) directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue not more than 350,000 $1 silver coins in commemoration of Christa McAuliffe, a teacher tragically killed in the Space Shuttle Challenger Disaster. (Sec. 4) The design of the coins shall bear an image and the name of Christa McAuliffe on the obverse side and a design on the reverse side that depicts the legacy of McAuliffe as a teacher. (Sec. 5) Treasury may issue the coins from January 1-December 31, 2020. (Sec. 7) All surcharges received by Treasury from the sale of the coins shall be paid to the FIRST robotics program for the purpose of engaging and inspiring young people, through mentor-based programs, to become leaders in the fields of science, technology, engineering, and mathematics.
Title
Christa McAuliffe Commemorative Coin Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-65. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2019-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7796-7797) |
2019-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 239. |
2019-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7796-7800) |
2019-09-19 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-07-10 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-07-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4739) |
2019-07-09 | Senate | S.Amdt.907 Amendment SA 907 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | S.Amdt.907 Amendment SA 907 proposed by Senator Thune for Senator Shaheen. (consideration: CR S4739; text: CR S4739) To improve the bill. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4739) |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB500 (Related) 2019-01-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Currency
Education programs funding
Finance and financial sector
Science and engineering education
Space flight and exploration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Education programs funding
Finance and financial sector
Science and engineering education
Space flight and exploration
Teaching, teachers, curricula