US SB2382 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the Office of the National Cyber Director to accept officers or employees of the United States or members of the Armed Forces on a detail from an element of the intelligence community or from another element of the federal government on a nonreimbursable basis for up to three years. The Office of the National Cyber Director is the principal advisor to the President on cybersecurity policy and strategy and, among other duties, leads the coordination and implementation of national cyber policy and strategy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to authorize the National Cyber Director to accept details from other elements of the Federal Government on nonreimbursable basis, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-26HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-07-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2382.
2021-07-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3881-3883; text: CR H3881-3882)
2021-07-26HouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-07-26HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-07-26HouseReceived in the House.
2021-07-26SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-07-22SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5057; text: CR S5057-5058)
2021-07-20SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 105.
2021-07-19SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback