US SB238 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize the President to award the Medal of Honor to James Megellas, formerly of Fond du Lac, Wisconsin, and currently of Colleyville, Texas, for acts of valor on January 28th, 1945, during the Battle of the Bulge in World War II. This bill authorizes the President to award the Medal of Honor to James Megellas for acts of valor on January 28, 1945, during the Battle of the Bulge in World War II.
Title
A bill to authorize the President to award the Medal of Honor to James Megellas, formerly of Fond du Lac, Wisconsin, and currently of Colleyville, Texas, for acts of valor on January 28th, 1945, during the Battle of the Bulge in World War II.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB751 (Same As) 2017-02-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Belgium
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Europe
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Belgium
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Europe
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/238/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s238/BILLS-115s238is.pdf |