US SB238 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 114-133. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Became Public Law No: 114-133. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eric Williams Correctional Officer Protection Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the federal criminal code to require the Bureau of Prisons (BOP) to issue oleoresin capsicum spray (i.e., pepper spray) to officers and employees who respond to emergency situations at high-security, medium-security, and administrative facilities. Officers and employees may use pepper spray to reduce violent acts by prisoners and visitors. An officer of employee must complete a training course prior to receiving pepper spray and annually thereafter on its use. (Sec. 3) The Government Accountability Office must: (1) evaluate the effect of issuing pepper spray on reducing crime and violence in high-security, medium-security, and administrative facilities; (2) evaluate the advisability of issuing pepper spray at low- or minimum-security facilities; and (3) recommend safety improvements for BOP officers and employees.
Title
Eric Williams Correctional Officer Protection Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-133. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-03-01 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-02-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-02-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H865-866) |
2016-02-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 238. |
2016-02-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H865-869) |
2016-02-24 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-12-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-12-16 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8703-8704) |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8703-8704) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB472 (Same As) 2015-02-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB467 (Related) 2015-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S939-944)
SB2123 (Related) 2015-10-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 279.
SB467 (Related) 2015-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S939-944)
SB2123 (Related) 2015-10-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 279.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Department of Justice
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement officers
Violent crime
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Department of Justice
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement officers
Violent crime