US SB2377 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-312.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-312.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at 200 West 2nd Street in Dayton, Ohio, as the "Walter H. Rice Federal Building and United States Courthouse". (Sec. 1) This bill designates the federal building and U.S. courthouse located at 200 West 2nd Street in Dayton, Ohio, as the "Walter H. Rice Federal Building and United States Courthouse."
Title
A bill to designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at 200 West 2nd Street in Dayton, Ohio, as the "Walter H. Rice Federal Building and United States Courthouse".
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-312. |
2018-12-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-06 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-30 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9748) |
2018-11-30 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9748) |
2018-11-30 | House | Mr. Shuster asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-11-30 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2018-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-06-07 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-06-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3390; text: CR S3390) |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 429. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4449 (Same As) 2017-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Ohio
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Ohio