US SB235 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes grants for the establishment of professional development programs for teachers who remain in the classroom while also carrying out formalized leadership responsibilities.
Title
Teachers Are Leaders Act
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3108 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
HB4423 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
HB4423 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Higher education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Higher education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/235/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s235/BILLS-116s235is.pdf |