US SB2348 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to ensure reliable air service to American Samoa. This bill declares that in order to provide and sustain air transportation in American Samoa between the islands of Tutuila and Manu'a, the Department of Transportation may renew a foreign air carrier's emergency air transportation exemption every 180 days (instead of the current 30-day renewal period that applies to other areas).
Title
A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to ensure reliable air service to American Samoa.
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB276 (Same As) 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2997 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB2997 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
Subjects
American Samoa
Aviation and airports
Transportation and public works
U.S. territories and protectorates
Aviation and airports
Transportation and public works
U.S. territories and protectorates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2348/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2348/BILLS-115s2348is.pdf |