US SB2343 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Precision Agriculture Connectivity Act of 2018 (Sec. 3) This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to establish the Task Force for Reviewing the Connectivity and Technology Needs of Precision Agriculture in the United States. The task force must identify current gaps in the availability of broadband Internet access service on agricultural land and recommend policies to expand its deployment. The Department of Agriculture and the FCC shall jointly submit to the task force a list of all federal programs or resources available for the expansion of broadband Internet access service on unserved agricultural land. The FCC shall renew the task force every two years until it terminates on January 1, 2025.
Title
Precision Agriculture Connectivity Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-10 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7367-7368; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7367-7368) |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 615. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-342. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4881 (Same As) 2018-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
Subjects
Agricultural practices and innovations
Department of Agriculture
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Department of Agriculture
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications