US SB233 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-115. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the Rocksprings station of the U.S. Border Patrol located on West Main Street in Rocksprings, Texas, as the Donna M. Doss Border Patrol Station.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Donna M. Doss Memorial Act of 2021 Donna M. Doss Memorial Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-05SenateBecame Public Law No: 117-115. (TXT | PDF)
2022-05-05SenateSigned by President.
2022-05-03SenatePresented to President.
2022-03-30HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2022-03-30HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3994)
2022-03-30HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 233.
2022-03-30HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3994)
2022-03-30HouseMs. Williams (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-10-08HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-10-08HouseReceived in the House.
2021-10-08SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-10-07SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6991-6992; text: CR S6992)
2021-09-22SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 130.
2021-09-22SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
2021-09-22SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Committee consideration held. Business Meeting printed. S. Hrg. 117-108.
2021-09-22SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-02-04SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

HB858 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback