US SB2318 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-23 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-23 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Erie Canalway National Heritage Corridor Act to extend the Erie Canalway National Heritage Corridor Commission until 30 years (currently, 15 years) after December 21, 2000.
Title
A bill to reauthorize the Erie Canalway National Heritage Corridor Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4641 (Same As) 2014-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Subjects
Dams and canals
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Historic sites and heritage areas
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Historic sites and heritage areas
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2318/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2318/BILLS-113s2318is.pdf |