US SB2297 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 654.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 654.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Custer County Airport Conveyance Act
Title
Custer County Airport Conveyance Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 654. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 115-367. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4781 (Same As) 2018-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
South Dakota
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
South Dakota