US SB2296 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 448.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 448.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GOOD Act Guidance Out Of Darkness Act This bill requires an agency to: (1) publish guidance documents online on the dates they are issued, (2) publish all of its guidance documents that are in effect in a single location on regulations.gov, and (3) display a hyperlink on its website that provides access to the guidance documents on regulations.gov. The documents must be categorized as guidance documents and further divided into subcategories. On the date a guidance document is rescinded, an agency must add an indication on regulations.gov that the guidance document is rescinded and the date on which it was rescinded.
Title
GOOD Act Guidance Out Of Darkness Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 448. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-271. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4809 (Same As) 2018-09-27 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 586.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics