US SB2274 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 112 Wyoming Street in Shoshoni, Wyoming, as the "Dessie A. Bebout Post Office".
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 112 Wyoming Street in Shoshoni, Wyoming, as the "Dessie A. Bebout Post Office".
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-04-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2993; text: CR S2993) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 321. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2364-2366) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3918 (Related) 2023-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries.