US SB227 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 407.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Savanna's Act This bill directs the Department of Justice (DOJ) to review, revise, and develop law enforcement and justice protocols to address missing and murdered Native Americans. The bill requires DOJ to take the following actions: provide training to law enforcement agencies on how to record tribal enrollment for victims in federal databases, develop and implement a strategy to educate the public on the National Missing and Unidentified Persons System, conduct specific outreach to tribes, tribal organizations, and urban Native American organizations regarding the ability to publicly enter information through the National Missing and Unidentified Persons System or other non-law enforcement sensitive portal, develop guidelines for response to cases of missing and murdered Native Americans, provide training and technical assistance to tribes and law enforcement agencies for implementation of the developed guidelines, and report statistics on missing and murdered Native Americans. Tribes may submit their own guidelines to respond to cases of missing or murdered Native Americans to DOJ. The bill authorizes DOJ to provide grants for the purposes of (1) developing and implementing policies and protocols for law enforcement regarding cases of missing and murdered Native Americans, and (2) compiling and reporting data relating to missing and murdered Native Americans. Federal law enforcement agencies must modify their guidelines to incorporate the guidelines developed by DOJ. The Federal Bureau of Investigation shall include gender in its annual statistics on missing and unidentified persons published on its website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Savanna's Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 407.
2020-01-15SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-206.
2019-11-20SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-06-19SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
2019-01-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2733 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback