US SB225 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mount Hood Cooper Spur Land Exchange Clarification Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009 to revise details of the Cooper Spur-Government Camp land exchange between the United States and Oregon. After the final appraised value of the federal and nonfederal lands is determined and approved by Department of Agriculture (USDA), the USDA shall not be required to reappraise or update that value for a period of up to three years, unless the condition of any of the lands is significantly and substantially altered by fire, windstorm, or other events. The bill revises conveyance conditions regarding reservation of a conservation easement to protect identified wetland, reservation of a nonexclusive trail easement, and equalization of values of the exchange properties.
Title
Mount Hood Cooper Spur Land Exchange Clarification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 65. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-52. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB699 (Same As) 2018-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 115-110. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Sports and recreation facilities
Wetlands
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Land use and conservation
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Sports and recreation facilities
Wetlands
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats