US SB2221 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 468.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 468.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RIP MSP Act Repeal Insurance Plans of the Multi-State Program Act This bill repeals a provision of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act that allows the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) to enter into contracts with health insurance issuers to offer multi-state plan options. OPM must report about specified efforts in its process to wind down the multi-state program. The bill rescinds specified unobligated funds that were provided to OPM for staffing and administering the multi-state program.
Title
RIP MSP Act Repeal Insurance Plans of the Multi-State Program Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] |
Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 468. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-277. Additional views filed. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4664 (Same As) 2017-12-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Appropriations
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Employee benefits and pensions
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Public contracts and procurement
Appropriations
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Employee benefits and pensions
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Public contracts and procurement