US SB2210 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No Pay Raise for Congress Act of 2012 - Eliminates automatic cost of living (COLA) adjustments for Members of Congress during FY2013.
Title
No Pay Raise for Congress Act of 2012
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3858 (Related) 2012-01-31 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB235 (Related) 2011-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
SB1931 (Related) 2011-12-08 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure, under the order of 12/8/2011, not having achieved the required 60 votes in the affirmative, was rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 22 - 76. Record Vote Number: 225. (consideration: CR S8445)
SB1936 (Related) 2011-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6474 (Related) 2012-09-20 - Referred to House Budget
HB235 (Related) 2011-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
SB1931 (Related) 2011-12-08 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure, under the order of 12/8/2011, not having achieved the required 60 votes in the affirmative, was rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 22 - 76. Record Vote Number: 225. (consideration: CR S8445)
SB1936 (Related) 2011-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6474 (Related) 2012-09-20 - Referred to House Budget
Subjects
Congress
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Inflation and prices
Members of Congress
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Inflation and prices
Members of Congress
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/2210/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s2210/BILLS-112s2210is.pdf |