US SB221 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
The bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to transmit specified information to the National Practitioner Data Bank and the applicable state licensing board when the VA brings a major adverse action against certain appointed VA medical employees. Specifically, the VA must transmit the employee's name and the description of and reason for the major adverse action. The VA may not enter into a settlement agreement regarding a claim by a VA employee under which it would be required to conceal a serious medical error or purge a negative record from an employee's personnel file. Such provision shall not apply to a negative record if the VA Office of Accountability and Whistleblower Protection and the Office of Special Counsel jointly certify that the negative record is not legitimate.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Provider Accountability Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-12-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-12-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1271 Amendment SA 1271 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1271 Amendment SA 1271 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Gardner. (consideration: CR S7229-7230; text: CR S7230) In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7229-7230) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employee performance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Medical ethics
Personnel records
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employee performance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Medical ethics
Personnel records
Veterans' medical care