US SB2166 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 660.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 660.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act
Title
Endangered Fish Recovery Programs Extension Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 660. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-374. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4465 (Same As) 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2563 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB2563 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Arizona
Colorado
Congressional oversight
Endangered and threatened species
Energy revenues and royalties
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Arizona
Colorado
Congressional oversight
Endangered and threatened species
Energy revenues and royalties
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection