US SB2162 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-05 - Became Public Law No: 114-86. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-05 - Became Public Law No: 114-86. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Librarian of Congress Succession Modernization Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill limits the term of the Librarian of Congress to 10 years. The individual appointed to the position may be reappointed in accordance with this requirement.
Title
Librarian of Congress Succession Modernization Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-86. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-11-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2015-10-26 | House | Presented to President. |
2015-10-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-10-20 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7012) |
2015-10-20 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7012) |
2015-10-20 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. (consideration: CR H7012) |
2015-10-20 | House | Mr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H7012) |
2015-10-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2015-10-08 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-10-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7224; text as passed Senate: CR S7224) |
Subjects
Congress
Congressional agencies
Federal officials
Libraries and archives
Library of Congress
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Congressional agencies
Federal officials
Libraries and archives
Library of Congress
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents