US SB2160 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-429. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-429. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Collaboration for Healthier Forests Act
Title
Protect Collaboration for Healthier Forests Act
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-429. Minority views filed. |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 720. |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Congressional oversight
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Insects
Judicial review and appeals
Pest management
Public lands and natural resources
Congressional oversight
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Insects
Judicial review and appeals
Pest management
Public lands and natural resources