US SB2156 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Migratory Bird Habitat Investment and Enhancement Act - Amends the Migratory Bird Hunting and Conservation Stamp Act (the Act) to allow the Secretary of the Interior, for each 5-year period beginning in 2013, to set the amount to be collected for each Federal Migratory Bird Hunting and Conservation Stamp sold under the Act. Prohibits such amount from exceeding $25 for the first 5-year period and $30 for any subsequent period. Requires the U.S. Postal Service (USPS) or the Department of the Interior to collect the amount established for each Stamp sold for a hunting year if the Secretary determines, at any time before February 1 of a calendar year, that all amounts in the Migratory Bird Conservation Fund have been obligated for expenditure. Specifies that the amounts described in this Act are the amounts in the Migratory Bird Conservation Fund which are available for obligation and attributable to amounts appropriated pursuant to the Act and the sale of stamps under this Act. Permits the Secretary, in consultation with the Migratory Bird Conservation Commission, to waive requirements under the Act relating to the prohibition on the taking of migratory waterfowl with respect to certain individuals as determined to be appropriate. Instructs the Secretary, in making a determination to waive such requirements, to grant only those waivers that will have a minimal adverse effect on the funds to be deposited into the Migratory Bird Conservation Fund.
Title
Migratory Bird Habitat Investment and Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518. |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer with amendments. With written report No. 112-216. |
2012-07-25 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife. Hearings held. |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Subjects
Animals
Birds
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Postal service
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Birds
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Postal service
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection