US SB2135 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fix NICS Act of 2017 This bill amends the Brady Handgun Violence Prevention Act to require each federal agency and department, including a federal court, to: certify whether it has provided to the National Instant Criminal Background Check System (NICS) disqualifying records of persons prohibited from receiving or possessing a firearm, and establish and substantially comply with an implementation plan to maximize record submissions and verify their accuracy. The bill amends the NICS Improvement Amendments Act of 2007 to: direct the Department of Justice (DOJ) to establish a state implementation plan, including benchmarks, to maximize the automation and submission of mental health and criminal history records to the NICS; waive the grant match requirement under the National Criminal History Improvement Program (NCHIP) for a state that complies with its implementation plan; reauthorize through FY2022 the NICS Act Record Improvement Program (NARIP); establish, as a priority area for NARIP grant funding, a domestic abuse and violence prevention initiative; and create a funding preference under the NARIP program for states that establish an implementation plan and use grant funds to upload felony conviction and domestic violence records. It amends the Crime Identification Technology Act of 1998 to reauthorize through FY2022 the NCHIP program. If a state complies with its implementation plan, then the federal share of an NCHIP grant may exceed 90% of program costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fix NICS Act of 2017

Sponsors

Sen. John Cornyn [R]Sen. Christopher Murphy [D]Sen. Tim Scott [R]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D]
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R]Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D]Sen. Dean Heller [R]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D]
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D]Sen. Pat Toomey [R]Sen. Lamar Alexander [R]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D]
Sen. Christopher Coons [D]Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R]Sen. Susan Collins [R]Sen. Richard Durbin [D]
Sen. Kamala Harris [D]Sen. Angus King [I]Sen. Mitch McConnell [R]Sen. Rob Portman [R]
Sen. Charles Schumer [D]Sen. Thom Tillis [R]Sen. Michael Bennet [D]Sen. Ron Johnson [R]
Sen. Bob Corker [R]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D]Sen. James Lankford [R]
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D]Sen. Joni Ernst [R]Sen. Jerry Moran [R]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D]
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D]Sen. Pat Roberts [R]Sen. John Hoeven [R]Sen. Ron Wyden [D]
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R]Sen. Edward Markey [D]Sen. John McCain [R]Sen. Bill Nelson [D]
Sen. Marco Rubio [R]Sen. Bernard Sanders [I]Sen. Gary Peters [D]Sen. John Thune [R]
Sen. Roy Blunt [R]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D]Sen. Todd Young [R]Sen. Mark Warner [D]
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D]Sen. Lindsey Graham [R]Sen. Richard Burr [R]Sen. James Inhofe [R]
Sen. Joe Manchin [D]Sen. Joe Donnelly [D]Sen. Maria Cantwell [D]Sen. Chuck Grassley [R]
Sen. John Boozman [R]Sen. Thad Cochran [R]Sen. Deb Fischer [R]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D]
Sen. Tim Kaine [D]Sen. Jeff Merkley [D]Sen. Shelley Capito [R]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D]
Sen. Tina Smith [D]Sen. Tom Udall [D]Sen. Doug Jones [D]Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D]
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D]Sen. Thomas Carper [D]Sen. Robert Casey [D]Sen. Brian Schatz [D]
Sen. Cory Booker [D]Sen. Bill Cassidy [R]Sen. Patrick Leahy [D]Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D]
Sen. Jack Reed [D]Sen. Claire McCaskill [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
2017-12-06SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
2017-11-15SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7163-7265)

Same As/Similar To

HB4434 (Same As) 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4477 (Related) 2017-12-05 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 322.
HB38 (Related) 2017-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback