US SB2116 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Secretary of Commerce to produce a report that provides recommendations to improve the effectiveness, efficiency, and impact of Department of Commerce programs related to supply chain resilience and manufacturing and industrial innovation, and for other purposes.
Title
Strengthening Support for American Manufacturing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-05-01 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3084; text: CR S3084) |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 290. |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2116 (Related) 2024-05-01 - Held at the desk.
HB8657 (Related) 2024-06-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB8657 (Related) 2024-06-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.