US SB2097 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent the permissible first-dollar coverage of telehealth services for purposes of health savings accounts.
Title
TELEHEALTH HSA Act of 2021 Telemedicine Everywhere Lifting Everyone’s Healthcare Experience And Long Term Health HSA Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB341 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1704 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5981 (Related) 2021-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1704 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5981 (Related) 2021-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2097/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2097/BILLS-117s2097is.pdf |