US SB2095 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assault Weapons Ban of 2017 This bill amends the federal criminal code to make it a crime to knowingly import, sell, manufacture, transfer, or possess a semiautomatic assault weapon (SAW) or large capacity ammunition feeding device (LCAFD). The prohibition does not apply to a firearm that is: (1) manually operated by bolt, pump, lever, or slide action; (2) permanently inoperable; (3) an antique; or (4) a rifle or shotgun specifically identified by make and model. Additionally, the bill does not prohibit, with respect to a SAW or LCAFD: importation, sale, manufacture, transfer, or possession related to certain law enforcement efforts, or authorized tests or experiments; importation, sale, transfer, or possession related to securing nuclear materials; and possession by a retired law enforcement officer. The bill permits continued possession, sale, or transfer of a grandfathered SAW, which must be securely stored. A licensed gun dealer must conduct a background check prior to the sale or transfer of a grandfathered SAW between private parties. The bill permits continued possession of, but prohibits sale or transfer of, a grandfathered LCAFD. Newly manufactured LCAFDs must display serial number identification. Newly manufactured SAWs and LCAFDs must display the date of manufacture. The bill also amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to allow a state or local government to use Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant Program funds to compensate individuals who surrender a SAW or LCAFD under a buy-back program.
Title
Assault Weapons Ban of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7118-7119) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1945 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6366-6367)
HB5077 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB5087 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB5410 (Related) 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB6297 (Related) 2018-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB5077 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB5087 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB5410 (Related) 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB6297 (Related) 2018-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Justice
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Retail and wholesale trades
Trade restrictions
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Justice
Firearms and explosives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Licensing and registrations
Retail and wholesale trades
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2095/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2095/BILLS-115s2095is.pdf |