US SB2091 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOLT Act of 2015 Jobs Originated through Launching Travel Act of 2015 Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to admit into the United States a qualifying Canadian citizen over 50 years old and spouse for a period not to exceed 240 days (in a single 365-day period) if the person maintains a Canadian residence and owns a U.S. residence or has rented a U.S. accommodation for the duration of such stay. Revises the secure travel partnership program (the visa waiver program as renamed by this Act) to: (1) authorize DHS to designate any country as a program country; (2) adjust visa refusal rate criteria, including addition of a 3% maximum overstay rate; and (3) revise probationary and termination provisions. Expresses the sense of Congress that DHS should, in evaluating countries participating in the secure travel partnership program, give review priority to countries where circumstances indicate that such a review is necessary or desirable. Directs the Department of State to require U.S. diplomatic and consular missions to: (1) conduct nonimmigrant visa application interviews expeditiously, consistent with national security requirements and in recognition of resource allocation considerations; and (2) set a goal of interviewing 90% of all nonimmigrant visa applicants, worldwide, within 10 days of application receipt. Directs the State Department to: (1) develop and conduct a pilot program for processing visas using secure remote videoconferencing technology, and (2) seek to coordinate enrollment and interview processes for individuals eligible for both a U.S. visa and enrollment in the Global Entry program. Requires an alien at the time of application for U.S. entry under the secure travel partnership program to have a valid, unexpired electronic passport that incorporates biometric and document authentication identifiers that comply with internationally accepted practices.
Title
JOLT Act of 2015 Jobs Originated through Launching Travel Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1401 (Related) 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB2686 (Related) 2015-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
SB1507 (Related) 2015-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2686 (Related) 2015-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
SB1507 (Related) 2015-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Canada
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government information and archives
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Canada
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Government information and archives
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2091/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2091/BILLS-114s2091is.pdf |