US SB2069 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 336.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 336.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mount Hood Cooper Spur Land Exchange Clarification Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009 to revise details of the Cooper Spur-Government Camp land exchange between the United States and Oregon. After the final appraised value of the federal and nonfederal lands is determined and approved by Department of Agriculture (USDA), the USDA shall not be required to reappraise or update such value for a period of up to three years, unless the condition of any of the lands is significantly and substantially altered by fire, windstorm, or other events. It is the intent of Congress that the land exchange be completed within one year of this Act's enactment. Conveyance conditions are revised regarding reservation of a conservation easement for the protection of an identified wetland, reservation of a nonexclusive trail easement, and equalization of values of the exchange properties.
Title
Mount Hood Cooper Spur Land Exchange Clarification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 336. |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 114-191. |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6897-6898; text of measure as introduced: CR S6897-6898) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3826 (Same As) 2016-06-10 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 515.
Subjects
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wetlands
Land use and conservation
Oregon
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wetlands