US SB2060 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Burma Human Rights and Freedom Act of 2018 This bill authorizes assistance to victims of the military's ethnic cleansing campaign targeting the Rohingya people in Rakhine State, Burma (Myanmar), as well as technical assistance to investigate and prosecute crimes related to ethnic cleansing in Rakhine State. The bill imposes restrictions on international financial institution assistance, security cooperation, and trade. It calls on the President to determine whether specified individuals should be included in the list of specially designated nationals and blocked persons maintained by the Department of the Treasury's Office of Foreign Assets Control. The Departments of State and the Treasury and the U.S. Agency for International Development shall submit to Congress an assistance strategy to promote broad-based economic development in Burma.
Title
Burma Human Rights and Freedom Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 307. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4223 (Related) 2017-11-02 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3696 (Same As) 2018-11-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB3696 (Same As) 2018-11-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Asia
Bangladesh
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Burma
Child safety and welfare
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Evidence and witnesses
Farmland
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
Government liability
Historical and cultural resources
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Land use and conservation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Mining
Multilateral development programs
News media and reporting
North Korea
Political movements and philosophies
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
United Nations
Violent crime
Visas and passports
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Bangladesh
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Burma
Child safety and welfare
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Evidence and witnesses
Farmland
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
Government liability
Historical and cultural resources
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Land use and conservation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Mining
Multilateral development programs
News media and reporting
North Korea
Political movements and philosophies
Racial and ethnic relations
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sex offenses
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
United Nations
Violent crime
Visas and passports
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity