US SB2045 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR 6/9/2016 S3723)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR 6/9/2016 S3723)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Middle Class Health Benefits Tax Repeal Act of 2015 Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal, beginning with taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017, the excise tax on employer-sponsored health care coverage for which there is an excess benefit (high-cost plans).
Title
Middle Class Health Benefits Tax Repeal Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR 6/9/2016 S3723) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2050 (Related) 2015-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2075 (Related) 2015-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2075 (Related) 2015-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2045/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2045/BILLS-114s2045is.pdf |