US SB2035 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
Pending: House Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

TSA Credential and Endorsement Harmonization Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TSA Credential and Endorsement Harmonization Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2019-09-11HouseReceived in the House.
2019-09-11SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-09-10SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5411)
2019-09-10SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5411)
2019-07-24SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-06-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback