US SB2 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Effective Prosecution of Possession of Biological Toxins and Agents Act of 2018
Title
Effective Prosecution of Possession of Biological Toxins and Agents Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7821) |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7820-7821) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7326 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Chemical and biological weapons
Crime and law enforcement
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Terrorism