US SB1995 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-449.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-449.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Spurring Business in Communities Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 to: require the Small Business Administration (SBA), in reviewing and processing an entity's application to become a small business investment company (SBIC), to give first priority to an SBIC applicant located in an underlicensed state (i.e., a state in which the number of licensees per capita is less than the median number of licensees per capita for all states) with below median financing; and exempt applicants in underlicensed states from certain SBA capital requirements.
Title
Spurring Business in Communities Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Senate | By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-449. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 350. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment. Without written report. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4111 (Same As) 2018-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 115-333.