US SB1981 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Scale LNG Access Act of 2017 This bill amends the Natural Gas Act to state that an application under the Act for the exportation of natural gas that does not exceed 51.1 billion cubic feet per year shall be deemed to be consistent with the public interest and granted without modification or delay. The bill does not apply to exportation to any nation subject to sanctions imposed by the United States.
Title
Small Scale LNG Access Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-248. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4370 (Same As) 2017-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.