US SB1934 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alaska Remote Generator Reliability and Protection Act This bill directs the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to revise certain regulations regarding particulate matter emissions standards for nonemergency stationary diesel engines in remote areas of Alaska. The EPA must report on methods for assisting remote areas of Alaska in meeting specified energy needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alaska Remote Generator Reliability and Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06HouseHeld at the desk.
2018-12-06HouseReceived in the House.
2018-12-06SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-12-04SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7277-7278; text of measure as reported: CR S7278; text of measure as passed: CR S7278)
2018-11-26SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-379.
2018-09-18SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 576.
2018-09-18SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2018-09-18SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2017-11-14SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works Senate Subcommittee on Clean Air and Nuclear Safety. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-127.
2017-10-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback