US SB1930 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Earmark Elimination Act of 2011 - Makes it out of order in the Senate to consider a bill or resolution introduced in either chamber or any other measure that includes an earmark. Permits waiver of any or all such points of order by an affirmative vote of two-thirds of the Members. Makes this Act inapplicable to any authorization of appropriations to a federal entity if such authorization is not specifically targeted to a state, locality, or congressional district.
Title
Earmark Elimination Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Scott Brown [R-MA] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] | Sen. Jim DeMint [R-SC] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] |
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 243. |
2011-11-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3707 (Related) 2011-12-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
SB1936 (Related) 2011-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6474 (Related) 2012-09-20 - Referred to House Budget
SB1936 (Related) 2011-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6474 (Related) 2012-09-20 - Referred to House Budget
Subjects
Appropriations
Economics and public finance
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Legislative rules and procedure
Senate
Tariffs
Economics and public finance
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Legislative rules and procedure
Senate
Tariffs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/1930/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s1930/BILLS-112s1930pcs.pdf |