US SB1928 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 267.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 267.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Multilateral Aid Review Act of 2017 This bill establishes a United States Multilateral Aid Review to assess the value of U.S. government investments in multilateral entities. The President shall establish an interagency Multilateral Review Task Force to review U.S. participation in multilateral entities and report to Congress. The bill establishes the United States Multilateral Aid Review Peer Review Group to assist the task force.
Title
Multilateral Aid Review Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 267. |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4502 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Foreign aid and international relief
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Multilateral development programs
Performance measurement
United Nations
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Foreign aid and international relief
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Multilateral development programs
Performance measurement
United Nations