US SB1916 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on August 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 659.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 659.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Health Care Connectivity Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Communications Act of 1934 to include skilled nursing facilities among the types of health care providers that may request from a telecommunications carrier under the Universal Service Fund the necessary telecommunications and information services to serve persons who reside in rural areas at rates that are reasonably comparable to rates charged for similar services in urban areas.
Title
Rural Health Care Connectivity Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 659. |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/29/2016 without amendment. With written report No. 114-368. |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4111 (Same As) 2016-05-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 452.
HB2576 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-182. (TXT | PDF)
HB2576 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-182. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Health facilities and institutions
Health technology, devices, supplies
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Nursing
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Health technology, devices, supplies
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Nursing
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees