US SB1901 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LEED Act Leverage to Enhance Effective Diplomacy Act of 2017 This bill directs the President to: (1) impose property-blocking sanctions against the North Korean government, business entities that trade with North Korea, including specified Chinese entities, and affiliated persons or entities; (2) prohibit the opening, and strictly control the maintaining in the United States, of correspondent or payable-through accounts by a foreign financial institution that assisted in the importation, sale, or transfer of North Korean goods or services; and (3) impose specified sanctions against a person that imports, purchases, or transfers goods or services from the North Korean government or from such entities or affiliates. The North Korean Human Rights Act of 2004 is amended to extend assistance for human rights and democracy programs. The bill prescribes reporting requirements with respect to North Korea's ballistic missile and missile fuel program. The Department of State shall: (1) brief Congress on the status of U.S. diplomatic engagement with North Korea and of detained U.S. citizens, and (2) develop a diplomatic strategy to end the transfer of rocket fuels and chemical precursors to North Korea. The State Department may reduce its diplomatic presence in, and terminate or reduce foreign assistance to, countries that are not cooperating with diplomatic and economic efforts to isolate North Korea.
Title
LEED Act Leverage to Enhance Effective Diplomacy Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 279. |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4027 (Same As) 2017-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1562 (Related) 2017-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1562 (Related) 2017-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign labor
Foreign property
Freedom of information
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade restrictions
Trade secrets and economic espionage
United Nations
War and emergency powers
Asia
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign labor
Foreign property
Freedom of information
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade restrictions
Trade secrets and economic espionage
United Nations
War and emergency powers