US SB1901 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - Became Public Law No: 113-81.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-12 - Became Public Law No: 113-81.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.) Support for United States-Republic of Korea Civil Nuclear Cooperation Act - Authorizes the President to extend the term of the Agreement for Cooperation between the Government of the United States of America and the Government of the Republic of Korea Concerning Civil Uses of Atomic Energy to a date that is not later than March 19, 2016. Directs the President to report to Congress every 180 days on the progress of negotiations on a new U.S.-Korea civil nuclear cooperation agreement.
Title
Support for United States-Republic of Korea Civil Nuclear Cooperation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-81. |
2014-02-12 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-02-04 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-01-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-01-28 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H1472-1473) |
2014-01-28 | House | Mr. Royce asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2014-01-28 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1472-1473) |
2014-01-28 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-01-28 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-01-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S491; text as passed Senate: CR S491) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 295. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Subjects
Asia
Congressional oversight
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Nuclear power
South Korea
Congressional oversight
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Nuclear power
South Korea