US SB1890 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 383.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 383.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a program under which the Department of Energy must award grants for energy improvements (e.g., renovations to install energy efficiency or renewable energy technologies, repairs to improve indoor air quality, or purchases of zero-emission vehicles) at public school facilities.
Title
Renew America’s Schools Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 383. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3322 (Related) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Environmental education
Environmental health
Higher education
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Lighting, heating, cooling
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Public contracts and procurement
Wages and earnings
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy prices
Environmental education
Environmental health
Higher education
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Lighting, heating, cooling
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Public contracts and procurement
Wages and earnings