US SB1882 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 357.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 357.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nepal Recovery Act (Sec. 5) This bill authorizes the President to provide technical and financial assistance for programs that: (1) improve Nepal's basic infrastructure following the earthquakes in affected communities; (2) support economic growth, including through agriculture and small-scale enterprise opportunities; (3) promote health and basic education programs; and (4) support democracy programs that promote political reforms, including strengthening democratic institutions and rule of law. The United States Trade and Development Agency may provide accelerated response in Nepal for: project identification and investment analyses; trade capacity building and sector development activities, including technical assistance and feasibility studies that support investments in infrastructure that contribute to overseas development; and trade capacity building and sector development assistance supporting the establishment of industry standards, market liberalization, and other policy reform, with a particular focus on engineering and construction. (Sec. 6) The U.S Agency for International Development shall report to Congress regarding: the effectiveness of U.S. investment in Nepal in disaster risk reduction and recovery program improvement; and the effectiveness of international humanitarian and reconstruction assistance provided to Nepal, and a related assessment of U.S. anti-corruption efforts. The Department of State shall report to Congress regarding impediments to Nepal's recovery efforts. (Sec. 7) FY 2017-FY2018 appropriations are authorized.
Title
Nepal Recovery Act
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 357. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4674 (Related) 2016-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Asia
Aviation and airports
Building construction
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Domestic violence and child abuse
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Human rights
International affairs
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Multilateral development programs
Natural disasters
Nepal
Reconstruction and stabilization
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
U.S. and foreign investments
Women's employment
Women's rights
Youth employment and child labor
Aviation and airports
Building construction
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Domestic violence and child abuse
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Human rights
International affairs
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Multilateral development programs
Natural disasters
Nepal
Reconstruction and stabilization
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
U.S. and foreign investments
Women's employment
Women's rights
Youth employment and child labor