US SB1881 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-03 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure was not invoked (Record Vote No. 262) entered in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-03 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure was not invoked (Record Vote No. 262) entered in Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to prohibit Federal funding of Planned Parenthood Federation of America. This bill prohibits federal funding of Planned Parenthood Federation of America or its affiliates, subsidiaries, successors, or clinics.
Title
A bill to prohibit Federal funding of Planned Parenthood Federation of America.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-03 - Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed S. 1881 (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-08-03 - Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed S. 1881 (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-08-03 - Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed S. 1881 (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-03 | Senate | Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure was not invoked (Record Vote No. 262) entered in Senate. |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 46. Record Vote Number: 262. (consideration: CR S6227-6228; text: CR S6227) |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S6215-6228) |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (consideration CR S6161; text: CR S6161) |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration CR S6161-6164, S6166-6180) |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 169. |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3301 (Same As) 2015-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1861 (Related) 2015-07-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 164.
SB1861 (Related) 2015-07-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 164.
Subjects
Abortion
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Sex and reproductive health
Women's health
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Sex and reproductive health
Women's health