US SB1836 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defund Planned Parenthood Act of 2015 This bill prohibits, for a one-year period, the availability of federal funds for any purpose to Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., or any of its affiliates or clinics, unless they certify that the affiliates and clinics will not perform, and will not provide any funds to any other entity that performs, an abortion during such period. The restriction will not apply in cases of rape or incest or where a physical condition endangers a woman's life unless an abortion is performed. The Department of Health and Human Services and the Department of Agriculture must seek repayment of federal assistance received by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., or any affiliate or clinic, if it violates the terms of the certification required by this Act.
Title
Defund Planned Parenthood Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] |
Sen. Jeff Sessions [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3134 (Same As) 2015-09-22 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 235.
HCR79 (Related) 2015-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB764 (Related) 2016-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-216. (TXT | PDF)
HCR79 (Related) 2015-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB764 (Related) 2016-07-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-216. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Abortion
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Sex and reproductive health
Women's health
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Sex and reproductive health
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/1836/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s1836/BILLS-114s1836is.pdf |