US SB1826 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-138. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-138. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 99 West 2nd Street in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin, as the Lieutenant Colonel James "Maggie" Megellas Post Office. Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 99 West 2nd Street in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin, as the Lieutenant Colonel James "Maggie" Megellas Post Office.
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 99 West 2nd Street in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin, as the Lieutenant Colonel James "Maggie" Megellas Post Office.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 406 N: 1 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-138. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-03-18 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-03-15 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-03-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-03-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 1 (Roll no. 108). (text: CR 3/01/2016 H1070) |
2016-03-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: H1128-1129) |
2016-03-03 | House | UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question of adoption of motion to suspend the rules which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed. |
2016-03-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Russell objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed until March 2. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2016-03-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1826. |
2016-03-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1070-1071) |
2016-03-01 | House | Mr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-10-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-10-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-09-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2015-09-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6424-6425; text as passed Senate: CR S6424-6425) |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 173. |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3507 (Same As) 2015-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Wisconsin
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Wisconsin